Alshanti, Amin Abdul Hafiz (CPSO#: 80283)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2003 to 07 Jan 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004