Alsharafi, Zuhair Mohammed A (CPSO#: 86001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Emergency Medicine
Suite C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZUHAIR MOHAMMED A ALSHARAFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHARAFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2007 to 03 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009