Alshuhayeb, Anas Saad I (CPSO#: 94992)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014