Alston, Lindsay Rebecca (CPSO#: 95941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Alston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Alston ( CPSO# 95941 )

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY REBECCA ALSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2014