Alsugair, Abdullah Mohamed N (CPSO#: 75850)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 06 Feb 2002 to 05 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 06 Feb 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003