Alsuhail, Abdullah Ibrahim A (CPSO#: 89532)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Palliative Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011