Altaweel, Mike Mostafa (CPSO#: 62632)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: Atwell, Mike Mostafa (used until: 12 Apr 2000 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2000