Alturkustani, Murad Abdulkareem M (CPSO#: 88671)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 01 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
PEAP - Resident - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2009 to 01 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Feb 2010 to 01 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2010 to 01 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2011 to 01 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2014