Alvarez Higuera, Andrea del Pilar (CPSO#: 87314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Militar Nueva Granada, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Mental Health Association
80 Waterloo Avenue
Guelph ON  N1H0A1
Phone: (519) 821-2060
Fax: (519) 821-6139
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
125 Delhi St.
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6440
Fax: (519) 837-6773
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Alvarez Higuera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alvarez Higuera ( CPSO# 87314 )

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
Comprehensive Psychiatric Care Unit
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
Canadian Mental Health Association
80 Waterloo Avenue
Guelph ON  N1H 0A1
Phone Number: (519) 821-2060

Business Address:
The Wellness Collaborative
Suites 403 & 405
147 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 4E9
Phone Number: (519) 766-7786

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA DEL PILAR ALVAREZ HIGUERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALVAREZ HIGUERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 22 Feb 2010 to 31 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011