Alvi, Saima (CPSO#: 97027)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017