Alway, John (CPSO#: 87299)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 07 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University--Pleven, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 18 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 19 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2011