Alzaabi, Mohamed Ebrahim Salem Jassim Bin Yakoob (CPSO#: 81702)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Resident - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2004 to 22 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006