Alzahrani, Azzah Saleh Banyan (CPSO#: 80521)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 24 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2007