Alzahrani, Daifulah Mohamed Said Alzobir (CPSO#: 80066)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Khalid University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006