Alzahrani, Saud Abdullah A (CPSO#: 97855)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Jun 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018