Amad, Hani (CPSO#: 77874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 8-406
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5386
Fax: (416) 603-5274
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amad & Albashir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Albashir ( CPSO# 98972 )
Dr. H. Amad ( CPSO# 77874 )

Business Address:
HSC 3V3
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
East Wing 8-406
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5386

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 19 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANI AMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006