Amaladoss, Noel Rufus (CPSO#: 85368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6-1401 Plains Road East
Burlington , Ontario
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Noel R. Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Amaladoss ( CPSO# 85368 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 Northshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Business Address:
Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7S 1Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOEL RUFUS AMALADOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMALADOSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 10 Jul 2006 to 12 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011