Amankwah, Yaa Obesebea Asamoa (CPSO#: 79706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Fax: (613) 738-8524
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Origyns Medical clinic
1355 Bank street
Suite 205
K1H 8K7
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: 613 721 2907
Fax: 613 518 6555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yaa Amankwah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Amankwah ( CPSO# 79706 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2

Business Address:
Suite 205
1355 Banks Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 521-2391

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
7th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAA OBESEBEA ASAMOA AMANKWAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMANKWAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008