Amaral, Joao Guilherme Pires Vieira Do (CPSO#: 75933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Federal University of Parana, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201652
Fax: (416) 813-7163
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Joao Guilherme Pires Vieira Do Amaral may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Amaral holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr. Amaral no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.