Amaratunga, Kanchana Rajindri (CPSO#: 88899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Colonnade Road Room 307B-04
A/L: 6503B
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 355-8288
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANCHANA RAJINDRI AMARATUNGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMARATUNGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2013