Ambalavanar, Elancheliyan (CPSO#: 85074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:UNIVERSITY OF SRI JAYEWARDENEPURA, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7270
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2035 Sheppard Ave E #4,
Toronto ON  M2J 0A8
Canada
Phone: (647) 351-1411
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Emergency Department
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue south
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

55 Dundas street east
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Canada
Phone: (416) 361-6000
Fax: (416) 361-6044
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Ambalavanar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ambalavanar ( CPSO# 85074 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7270

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000

Business Address:
E4 - 2035 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 0A8
Phone Number: (647) 351-1411


Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gupta ( CPSO# 82857 )
Dr. E. Ambalavanar ( CPSO# 85074 )
Dr. W. Cheema ( CPSO# 82070 )

Business Address:
Cloud Care Clinic
55 Dundas Street East
Basement Level
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 361-6000


Corporation Name: Ambalavanar Cheema Hussain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ambalavanar ( CPSO# 85074 )
Dr. W. Cheema ( CPSO# 82070 )
Dr. S. Hussain ( CPSO# 102276)

Business Address:
Legacy Cloud Medical Clinic
Unit 4
2035 Sheppard Avenue
North York ON  M2J 0A8
Phone Number: (647) 351-1411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELANCHELIYAN AMBALAVANAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBALAVANAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008