Ambraska, Heather Katharina (CPSO#: 97681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-4540
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Ambraska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ambraska ( CPSO# 97681 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-4540

Business Address:
Clarksburg Medical Group
186 Marsh Street
Clarksburg ON  N0H 1J0
Phone Number: (516) 599-5775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER KATHARINA AMBRASKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBRASKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2015 to 12 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014