Amer, Amal Abdel-Moneim Morssi Mohamed (CPSO#: 90884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quality Medical Clinic
1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 3G1
Phone: (613) 627-3901
Fax: (613) 627-3902
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Canada
Phone: 613-482-0118
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Box 819
5541 Ann Street First Floor
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: 613-692-5435
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amal Amer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amer ( CPSO# 90884 )

Business Address:
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
1375 Baeline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 3G1
Phone Number: (613) 627-3901

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAL ABDEL-MONEIM MORSSI MOHAMED AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011