Ames, Christina Marie (CPSO#: 92194)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2009 to 15 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2013