Amhalhal, Ismeil Moammar Alkantari (CPSO#: 76871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
THUNDER BAY REGIONAL HEALTH SCIENCE
Department of Internal Medicine
980 OLIVER ROAD
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6001
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1165 BARTON ST
Thunder Bay ON  P7B5N3
Canada
Phone: 8073453355
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amhalhal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Amhalhal ( CPSO# 76871 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3390

Business Address:
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 345-3355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISMEIL MOAMMAR ALKANTARI AMHALHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMHALHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 25 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006