Amiel, Sarah Caitlin (CPSO#: 93236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clairhurst Medical Center
Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Josephs Health Centre
Department Of Pediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Firszt & S. Amiel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amiel ( CPSO# 93236 )
Dr. M. Firszt ( CPSO# 93242 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 921-2121

Business Address:
Clairhurst Medical Centre
Suite 201
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 531-3331

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH CAITLIN AMIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014