Amin, Faizan Zulqarnain (CPSO#: 93458)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 Commercial Street
Suite 109
Milton ON  L9T3Z9
Phone: 9058789805
Fax: 9058786358
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faizan Amin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Amin ( CPSO# 93458 )

Business Address:
109 - 311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (908) 878-9805

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAIZAN ZULQARNAIN AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014