Amin, Md Shahrier (CPSO#: 89523)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dhaka, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2013