Amin, Nalin Kumar (CPSO#: 78232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Room G815 8Th Floor
Sister Mary Grace Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 37320
Fax: (905) 308-7226
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James St
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Amin ( CPSO# 78232 )

Business Address:
GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Room G815 8th Floor
Sister Mary Grace Wing
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NALIN KUMAR AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002