Amin Nasr, Ahmed Mohamed (CPSO#: 78937)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Apr 2003 to 16 May 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 17 May 2003 to 14 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Apr 2004