Amin, Reham Tarek (CPSO#: 83457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6481
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Reham Amin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Amin ( CPSO# 83457 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6T 3S1
Phone Number: (647) 896-5852

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REHAM TAREK AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007