Amin, Reshma (CPSO#: 77902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Respiratory Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6346
Fax: (416) 813-6246
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonard Grinblat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Grinblat ( CPSO# 77591 )
Dr. R. Amin ( CPSO# 77902 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Radiology
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 635-2550

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RESHMA AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009