Amin, Sheikh Noor Ul (CPSO#: 93950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Wincott Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Phone: (416) 249-0842
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5230 Dundas St West
Etobicoke ON  M9B1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-234-8668
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

107-6750 Winston Churchill Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5N 4V4
Canada
Phone: 905-785-9952
Fax: 905-785-8328
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

330 Bay Street, Suite 509
Toronto ON  M5H2S8
Canada
Phone: 4162140888
Fax: 4162140666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

west mississauga medical
3050 argentia road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 785-3627
Fax: (905) 785-3628
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.N. Amin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 93950 )

Business Address:
3050 Argentia Road
Mississauga ON  L5N 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 785-3627

Business Address:
250 Wincott Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 249-0842

Business Address:
102 - 2489 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 760-8280

Business Address:
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 234-8668

Business Address:
4A - 345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone Number: (416) 515-8853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEIKH NOOR UL AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010