Amin, Shubarna (CPSO#: 95652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markington Square
3227 Eglinton Avenue East
Unit #143-144
Scarborough ON  M1J3M5
Canada
Phone: 4162614446
Fax: 4162614447
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUBARNA AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2016