Amjadi, Kayvan (CPSO#: 73618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Box 211
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79679
Fax: (613) 739-6993
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kayvan Amjadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Amjadi ( CPSO# 73618 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Box 211
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAYVAN AMJADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMJADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005