Amlani, Salima (CPSO#: 82524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: Amlani, Salima Aminmohamed (used until: 07 Jul 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathcona Clinic
203 -2245 abbott street
kelowna BC  V1Y1E2
Phone: 236 420 0389
Fax: 236 420 0528
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kelowna General Hospital
2268 Pandosy Street
Kelowna BC  V1Y 1T2
Canada
Phone: (250) 862-4000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALIMA AMLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMLANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2009