Ammad, Mahjabeen (CPSO#: 83136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Kashmiri, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10A
30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3E7
Phone: (905) 712-2288
Fax: (905) 712-8228
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Streetsville Glen Medical Centre
Walk in
Suite 2B
7955 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 455-8877
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahjabeen Ammad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ammad ( CPSO# 83136 )

Business Address:
10A - 30 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 712-2288

Business Address:
2B - 7955 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0J8
Phone Number: (905) 455-8877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHJABEEN AMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007