Ammura, Ibtesam Ali (CPSO#: 68671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.A. Eddeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2009


Corporation Name: A.A. Eddeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Eddeb ( CPSO# 68659 )
Dr. I. Ammura ( CPSO# 68671 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBTESAM ALI AMMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMMURA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 15 Feb 1997
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 16 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Mar 1998
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Apr 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2002