Amster, Solomon Lawrence (CPSO#: 91799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Oct 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-6236
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samoila ( CPSO# 82340 )
Dr. S. Amster ( CPSO# 91799 )

Business Address:
206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-1490


Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Solomon Lawrence Amster may practise medicine independently in Family
                  Medicine, only.