Amurawaiye, Emmanuel Olugbemiga (CPSO#: 60254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2B
201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K5
Phone: (905) 576-1936
Fax: (905) 576-2406
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Corporation
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E.Amurawaiye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amurawaiye ( CPSO# 60254 )

Business Address:
2B - 201 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K5
Phone Number: (905) 576-1936

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL OLUGBEMIGA AMURAWAIYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMURAWAIYE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1991