Amyot, Shawn Richard (CPSO#: 90941)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
311 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2G9
Phone: (613) 235-8346
Fax: (613) 235-8347
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shawn Amyot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amyot ( CPSO# 90941 )

Business Address:
311 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2G9
Phone Number: (613) 235-8346

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN RICHARD AMYOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMYOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011