An, Pamela Hyun-Joo (CPSO#: 91596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WellOne Medical Centre
Suite 103
18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone: (647) 748-5663
Fax: (647) 740-7166
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAMELA HYUN-JOO AN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011