Anand, Anju (CPSO#: 79382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 6045
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 6026
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ellesmere Sleep Disorder
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-0130
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

135 Queens Plate Drive
Brain & Sleep Ltd
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 2315770
Fax: (416) 622-7831
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anand & Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grewal ( CPSO# 79379 )
Dr. A. Anand ( CPSO# 79382 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing
6-045 - 30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6026

Business Address:
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 439-0130

Business Address:
40 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 2X8

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 08 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJU ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007