Anand, Sondekere Kaminolu (CPSO#: 84149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Anaesthesiology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-1661 Ext. 52201
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rose City Endoscopy
2109 Ottawa St
Unit 1060
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-4154
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2224 Walker Road
Windsor
Windsor ON  N8W 3P6
Canada
Phone: 519-252-2020
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sondekere Anand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anand ( CPSO# 84149 )

Business Address:
Rose City Endoscopy
Suite 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 254-4154

Business Address:
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 256-8111

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-1661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Sep 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Mar 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Mar 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2007 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Sondekere  Kaminolu  Anand  may practise independently only in the area of
            Anaesthesia.