Anand, Subhapradha (CPSO#: 89684)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2008 to 27 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011