Anantharajah, Rokeni Sumi (CPSO#: 97576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Park Medical Centre
2867 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2S8
Phone: 647-557-3377
Fax: 647-557-3363
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROKENI SUMI ANANTHARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANANTHARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014