Anawati, Alexandre Georges (CPSO#: 93916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol Rd
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-3110
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Anawati Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Anawati ( CPSO# 93916 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRE GEORGES ANAWATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAWATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 05 Jul 2010 to 01 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011