Anchala, Krishnapriya Reddy (CPSO#: 81904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Missouri(Kansas City), 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
Room 1436
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5710
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Krishnapriya Reddy Anchala may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of Toronto, in which Dr. Anchala holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Anchala no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.