Andany, Nisha (CPSO#: 95684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H266 - 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6044
Fax: (416) 480-4268
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (416) 452-0924
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nisha Andany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Andany ( CPSO# 95684 )

Business Address:
SunnyBrook Health Sciences Centre
H266
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6044

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHA ANDANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015