Anderson, Alethea Jean (CPSO#: 108004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rugged Shores Family Health
60 Bowes Street, Suite 101
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone: (705) 746-2181
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alethea Anderson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Anderson ( CPSO# 108004)

Business Address:
Rugged Shores Family Health
Suite 101
60 Bowes Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 2L3
Phone Number: (705) 746-2181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALETHEA JEAN ANDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Oct 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jan 2016 to 02 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2016 to 01 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2017